NY S06356 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.
Title
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2021-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6356A |
2021-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07208 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - enacting clause stricken