NY S06356 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that health care decisions regarding routine medical treatment for adult patients without surrogates are not required to be reviewed by an ethics committee.
Title
Provides that health care decisions regarding routine medical treatment for adult patients without surrogates are not required to be reviewed by an ethics committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.622 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1452 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6356 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-06 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.221 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1124 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1452 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01124 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - signed chap.622