NY S06323 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Scajaquada pedestrian bridge as the "9/11 Memorial Bridge" in Buffalo; requires the commissioner of transportation to install and maintain adequate signing.
Title
Designates the Scajaquada pedestrian bridge as the "9/11 Memorial Bridge" in Buffalo; requires the commissioner of transportation to install and maintain adequate signing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.252 |
2012-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09329 (Same As) 2012-02-16 - referred to transportation