NY S06322 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing alcohol and substance abuse treatment in another jurisdiction for defendants in judicial diversion programs.
Title
Relates to authorizing alcohol and substance abuse treatment in another jurisdiction for defendants in judicial diversion programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.315 |
2016-08-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.807 |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9104a |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6322A |
2016-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.637 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A09104 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - substituted by s6322a