NY S06317 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Faith Evangelical Lutheran Church to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption for certain property.
Title
Authorizes the Faith Evangelical Lutheran Church to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption for certain property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.316 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.608 |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | substituted for a8018 |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2022-02-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.360 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.956 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08018 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - substituted by s6317