NY S06301 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the award of contracts to small businesses, minority-owned business enterprises and women-owned business enterprises; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Relates to the award of contracts to small businesses, minority-owned business enterprises and women-owned business enterprises; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.97 |
2019-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.656 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7795 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1790 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07795 (Same As) 2019-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.97