NY S06282 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the imposition of community service for students in place of or in conjunction with suspension.
Title
Relates to the imposition of community service for students in place of or in conjunction with suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
2014-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.191 |
2014-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08509 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - referred to education