NY S06265 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that utility employees, who currently fall outside the definition of an employee that may receive the prevailing wage, fall under such wage requirements.
Title
Ensures that utility employees, who currently fall outside the definition of an employee that may receive the prevailing wage, fall under such wage requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.102 |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.758 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.610 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8083a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1789 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6265A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2019-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08083 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.102