NY S06265 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing alcoholic beverages as prizes in any game of chance.
Title
Relates to allowing alcoholic beverages as prizes in any game of chance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2016-05-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.236 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A08623 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to racing and wagering