NY S06253 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - VETOED MEMO.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - VETOED MEMO.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a line of duty disability presumption for any condition of impairment of health caused by diseases of the lung, resulting in total or partial disability or death of certain deputy sheriff members of a retirement system in certain cities.
Title
Provides for a line of duty disability presumption for any condition of impairment of health caused by diseases of the lung, resulting in total or partial disability or death of certain deputy sheriff members of a retirement system in certain cities.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.104 |
2023-11-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.828 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a6749 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1516 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A06749 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s6253