NY S06251 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - SIGNED CHAP.51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - SIGNED CHAP.51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Legislative and Judiciary Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Legislative and Judiciary Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.51 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-03-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-03-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-03-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.28 |
2012-03-30 | Assembly | substituted for a9051a |
2012-03-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-29 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.481 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6251B |
2012-03-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6251A |
2012-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09051 (Same As) 2012-03-30 - substituted by s6251b