NY S06235 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes dates all propositions to be voted upon by the qualified voters of any school district shall be held.
Title
Establishes dates all propositions to be voted upon by the qualified voters of any school district shall be held.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.866 |
2012-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |