NY S06231 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.462
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.462
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of criminal justice services to include all sex crimes of an offender on the registered sex offender database.
Title
Requires the division of criminal justice services to include all sex crimes of an offender on the registered sex offender database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.462 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.136 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a6074a |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-21 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6231A |
2014-05-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-12 | Senate | returned to senate |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-11 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2014-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.200 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06074 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s6231a