NY S06215 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a change of location of early voting polling places for certain special, primary and run-off primary elections when no voters of the municipality with the highest population within the county are eligible to vote.
Title
Authorizes a change of location of early voting polling places for certain special, primary and run-off primary elections when no voters of the municipality with the highest population within the county are eligible to vote.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6478 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.878 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06478 (Same As) 2021-05-21 - signed chap.110