NY A06478 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - signed chap.110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - signed chap.110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a change of location of early voting polling places for certain special, primary and run-off primary elections when no voters of the municipality with the highest population within the county are eligible to vote.
Title
Authorizes a change of location of early voting polling places for certain special, primary and run-off primary elections when no voters of the municipality with the highest population within the county are eligible to vote.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Assembly | signed chap.110 |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.878 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6215 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.213 |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06215 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6478