NY S06201 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to liens on self-service storage facilities.
Title
Relates to liens on self-service storage facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1608 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6201A |
2014-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |