NY S06195 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to critical utility infrastructure security and responsibility; relates to the protection of critical infrastructure in the state; provides that an electric or gas corporation or municipality shall not share, disclose or otherwise provide access to a customer's electrical or gas consumption data.
Title
Relates to critical utility infrastructure security and responsibility; relates to the protection of critical infrastructure in the state; provides that an electric or gas corporation or municipality shall not share, disclose or otherwise provide access to a customer's electrical or gas consumption data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.327 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.910 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07682 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations