NY S06195 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of provisions of the alcoholic beverage control law relating to temporary retail permits; provides that such provisions expire on October 12, 2013.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of provisions of the alcoholic beverage control law relating to temporary retail permits; provides that such provisions expire on October 12, 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9454 |
2012-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.804 |
2012-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09454 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - signed chap.141