NY S06190 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows meetings of members of a rural electric cooperative to be held partially or solely by means of electronic communication.
Title
Allows meetings of members of a rural electric cooperative to be held partially or solely by means of electronic communication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.220 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.226 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a7205 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1178 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07205 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - substituted by s6190