NY S06189 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain sex offenders who are released on parole may not enter public, association or free libraries.
Title
Provides that certain sex offenders who are released on parole may not enter public, association or free libraries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1066 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2061 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |