NY S06187 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the severity of the offense of sexual conduct against a child in the second degree.
Title
Increases the severity of the offense of sexual conduct against a child in the second degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.468 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6187A |
2021-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.866 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07079 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - signed chap.647