NY S06182 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Erin Merryn's law" to require provision of instruction to prevent child sexual exploitation and abuse in grades kindergarten through eight.
Title
Enacts "Erin Merryn's law" to require provision of instruction to prevent child sexual exploitation and abuse in grades kindergarten through eight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Assembly | referred to education |
2012-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.561 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08993 (Same As) 2012-06-13 - held for consideration in education