NY S06163 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of providing uniform polling hours during primary elections.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of providing uniform polling hours during primary elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.441 |
2019-10-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.190 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7709 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.906 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07709 (Same As) 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.441