NY S06154 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - VETOED MEMO.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - VETOED MEMO.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to teachers' rights; adds other specified personnel to teachers and teaching assistants where the board of cooperative educational services takes over a program.
Title
Relates to teachers' rights; adds other specified personnel to teachers and teaching assistants where the board of cooperative educational services takes over a program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | VETOED MEMO.9 | |
2010-03-18 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-02-22 | returned to senate | |
2010-02-22 | passed assembly | |
2010-02-22 | ordered to third reading cal.165 | |
2010-02-22 | substituted for a1812a | |
2010-02-08 | referred to education | |
2010-02-08 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-02-08 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-02-02 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-02-01 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-01-26 | 1ST REPORT CAL.60 | |
2010-01-12 | PRINT NUMBER 6154B | |
2010-01-12 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-09-21 | PRINT NUMBER 6154A | |
2009-09-21 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES | |
2009-09-03 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A1812-A (Same As) 2010-02-22 - substituted by s6154b