NY S06142 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the acquisition of lands previously comprising Pilgrim State Hospital by the Oak Brush Plain State Preserve, located on Long Island.
Title
Relates to the acquisition of lands previously comprising Pilgrim State Hospital by the Oak Brush Plain State Preserve, located on Long Island.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.167 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.529 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a5926b |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2022-04-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-21 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6142A |
2022-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.266 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1023 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05926 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s6142a