NY S06141 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public schools from denying admission to unvaccinated students if their parents submit a form stating that such vaccinations are contrary to their genuine and sincere religious beliefs.
Title
Prohibits public schools from denying admission to unvaccinated students if their parents submit a form stating that such vaccinations are contrary to their genuine and sincere religious beliefs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6141D |
2018-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6141C |
2017-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6141B |
2017-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6141A |
2017-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08123 (Same As) 2018-04-17 - print number 8123b