NY S06073 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - DEFEATED IN CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - DEFEATED IN CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of parks, recreation and historic preservation to take a parcel of land by the eminent domain procedure for a state park and community garden.
Title
Directs the commissioner of parks, recreation and historic preservation to take a parcel of land by the eminent domain procedure for a state park and community garden.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-03-07 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2015-10-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08569 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to judiciary