NY S06068 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes December third as "International Day of Persons with Disabilities".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes December third as "International Day of Persons with Disabilities".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.481
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.55
2012-06-06Assemblysubstituted for a9078
2012-05-16Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2012-05-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-05-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-05-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.735
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A09078 (Same As) 2012-06-06 - substituted by s6068

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback