NY S06054 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to excluding income from the employment of children when calculating income for the selection of tenants; excludes income from the employment of children under 18 and full-time students over 18 and earnings in excess of $480 per month.
Title
Relates to excluding income from the employment of children when calculating income for the selection of tenants; excludes income from the employment of children under 18 and full-time students over 18 and earnings in excess of $480 per month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1355 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6054A |
2016-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2015-09-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09865 (Same As) 2016-05-12 - print number 9865a