NY S06054 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8904
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8904
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the purchase of prescription drugs; relates to applicable terms and conditions of participating mail order or other non-retail pharmacy.
Title
Relates to the purchase of prescription drugs; relates to applicable terms and conditions of participating mail order or other non-retail pharmacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8904 |
2012-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.11 |
2012-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6054A |
2012-01-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08904 (Same As) 2012-02-17 - signed chap.11