NY S06021 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a military voter to apply for a military ballot by facsimile transmission or electronic mail; extends time for receipt of special federal and military ballots; makes permanent certain provisions relating to military and special federal ballots.
Title
Allows a military voter to apply for a military ballot by facsimile transmission or electronic mail; extends time for receipt of special federal and military ballots; makes permanent certain provisions relating to military and special federal ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A8376 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.165
S5595 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.165
S60444 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65097 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S5595 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.165
S60444 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65097 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES