NY S06004 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions of law relating to the resale of tickets to places of entertainment through June 30, 2018.
Title
Extends certain provisions of law relating to the resale of tickets to places of entertainment through June 30, 2018.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7701 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1014 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07701 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - signed chap.68