NY A07701 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - signed chap.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - signed chap.68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions of law relating to the resale of tickets to places of entertainment through June 30, 2018.
Title
Extends certain provisions of law relating to the resale of tickets to places of entertainment through June 30, 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | signed chap.68 |
2017-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1014 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6004 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.475 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S06004 (Same As) 2017-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7701