NY S05999 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7628A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7628A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an interagency council for the purpose of coordinated planning on issues related to older adults which shall assess current programs and services across multiple agencies and shall consider current and projected needs.
Title
Establishes an interagency council for the purpose of coordinated planning on issues related to older adults which shall assess current programs and services across multiple agencies and shall consider current and projected needs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7628A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1092 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07628 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - tabled