NY S05994 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a registration system for contractors and subcontractors engaged in public work and covered projects in order to better enforce existing labor laws and regulations in the public works industry.
Title
Establishes a registration system for contractors and subcontractors engaged in public work and covered projects in order to better enforce existing labor laws and regulations in the public works industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.105 |
2022-12-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.827 |
2022-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.392 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a1338c |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED 5994C |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AMENDED 5994B |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1216 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5994A |
2022-03-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2021-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01338 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s5994c