NY A01338 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s5994c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s5994c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a registration system for contractors and subcontractors engaged in public work and covered projects in order to better enforce existing labor laws and regulations in the public works industry.
Title
Establishes a registration system for contractors and subcontractors engaged in public work and covered projects in order to better enforce existing labor laws and regulations in the public works industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s5994c |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.392 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.392 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | print number 1338c |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 1338b |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | print number 1338a |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05994 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.105