NY S05956 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2017 until November 30, 2019, the expiration of the authority of the county of Suffolk to impose an additional 1% of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2017 until November 30, 2019, the expiration of the authority of the county of Suffolk to impose an additional 1% of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1564 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07606 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means