NY S05955 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - PRINT NUMBER 5955B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - PRINT NUMBER 5955B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to human trafficking awareness and training; requires employees of lodging facilities to have training in the recognition of a human trafficking victim; requires the division of criminal justice services, the office of temporary and disability assistance and the New York state interagency task force on human trafficking to approve a human trafficking recognition training program.
Title
Relates to human trafficking awareness and training; requires employees of lodging facilities to have training in the recognition of a human trafficking victim; requires the division of criminal justice services, the office of temporary and disability assistance and the New York state interagency task force on human trafficking to approve a human trafficking recognition training program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5955B |
2018-04-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5955A |
2018-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1001 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06834 (Same As) 2018-04-23 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS