NY S05944 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6671A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6671A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization of convening a working group on rare diseases; extends the deadline for such working group to submit a report on their findings regarding rare diseases.
Title
Extends the authorization of convening a working group on rare diseases; extends the deadline for such working group to submit a report on their findings regarding rare diseases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6671A |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.732 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5944A |
2021-04-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06671 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - signed chap.199