NY S05937 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to the department of environmental conservation's management of aquatic invasive species, spread prevention and penalties.
Title
Extends provisions relating to the department of environmental conservation's management of aquatic invasive species, spread prevention and penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.81 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.570 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a7692 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.773 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07692 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.81