NY S05909 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5909A
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5909A
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the Kerry Rose Fitzsimons fire safety act requiring interconnectable smoke detecting devices to be installed in certain residential buildings.
Title
Enacts the Kerry Rose Fitzsimons fire safety act requiring interconnectable smoke detecting devices to be installed in certain residential buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5909A |
2016-03-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2015-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04355 (Same As) 2016-03-28 - amended on third reading 4355a