NY A04355 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - amended on third reading 4355a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - amended on third reading 4355a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the Kerry Rose Fitzsimons fire safety act requiring interconnectable smoke detecting devices to be installed in certain residential buildings.
Title
Enacts the Kerry Rose Fitzsimons fire safety act requiring interconnectable smoke detecting devices to be installed in certain residential buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4355a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.178 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.339 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.339 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05909 (Same As) 2016-03-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5909A