NY S05872 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Bnos Bais Yaakov to file an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes Bnos Bais Yaakov to file an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.258 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.603 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7487 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1899 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07487 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5872