NY S05860 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3210A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the office of mental health to develop educational materials for educators regarding suicide prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the office of mental health to develop educational materials for educators regarding suicide prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A3210A
2018-06-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5860A
2018-02-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.401
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2017-06-07SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-03SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES

Same As/Similar To

A03210 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback