NY A03210 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the office of mental health to develop educational materials for educators regarding suicide prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the office of mental health to develop educational materials for educators regarding suicide prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.401
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5860A
2018-06-12SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.94
2018-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.94
2018-06-11Assemblyreported
2018-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-24Assemblyprint number 3210a
2018-05-24Assemblyamend and recommit to mental health
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to mental health
2017-01-27Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S05860 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3210A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03210&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03210&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03210
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03210&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03210A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03210&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03210&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03210&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03210&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A3210#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback