NY S05840 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7727A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7727A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a certificate of need process for assisted living programs; establishes a moratorium on the establishment of new assisted living programs whenever the director of the budget determines that the addition of new assisted living program beds would have a net negative fiscal impact on the medical assistance program.
Title
Establishes a certificate of need process for assisted living programs; establishes a moratorium on the establishment of new assisted living programs whenever the director of the budget determines that the addition of new assisted living program beds would have a net negative fiscal impact on the medical assistance program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7727A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1152 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07727 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - tabled