NY A07727 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a certificate of need process for assisted living programs; establishes a moratorium on the establishment of new assisted living programs whenever the director of the budget determines that the addition of new assisted living program beds would have a net negative fiscal impact on the medical assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a certificate of need process for assisted living programs; establishes a moratorium on the establishment of new assisted living programs whenever the director of the budget determines that the addition of new assisted living program beds would have a net negative fiscal impact on the medical assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1152
2017-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5840
2017-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.305
2017-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.305
2017-06-14Assemblyreported
2017-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-05-17Assemblyreference changed to health
2017-05-15Assemblyprint number 7727a
2017-05-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to aging
2017-05-11Assemblyreferred to aging

Same As/Similar To

S05840 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7727A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07727&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07727&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07727
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07727&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07727A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07727&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07727&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07727&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07727&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7727#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback