NY S05813 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-03 - APPROVAL MEMO.13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-03 - APPROVAL MEMO.13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Roosevelt Island operating corporation board of directors to provide financial assistance in the form of grants to not-for-profit organizations that provide services to residents.
Title
Authorizes the Roosevelt Island operating corporation board of directors to provide financial assistance in the form of grants to not-for-profit organizations that provide services to residents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-03 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.13 |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.517 |
2015-11-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.485 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7974b |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1594 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5813B |
2015-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2015-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5813A |
2015-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2015-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07974 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5813b