NY S05811 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health care facilities to respect each patient's religious beliefs with regard to the provision of health care.
Title
Requires health care facilities to respect each patient's religious beliefs with regard to the provision of health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.869 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1547 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08056 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to health