NY S05811 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8395
Status: Introduced on June 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8395
Summary
Changes the composition of the board of directors of the Executive Mansion Trust.
Title
Changes the composition of the board of directors of the Executive Mansion Trust.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8395 | |
2010-02-02 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-02-01 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-01-26 | 1ST REPORT CAL.51 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-06-08 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A8395 (Same As) 2010-03-10 - 3RD READING CAL.51
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05811&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |